Financial history RALPH RIDER

Charity number: 230464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.41k £6.25k £6.37k £7.32k £7.15k
Total expenditure £4.61k £11.51k £7.73k £6.65k £12.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A