BARTON WILLIAM RUSSELL BEQUEST

Charity number: 230536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £227 £248 £250 £255 £196
Total expenditure £370 £525 £250 £255 £196
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A