THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE

Charity number: 230888
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LINDSAY ALLASON-JONES Trustee
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
THE CLAYTON COLLECTION OF ROMAN ANTIQUITIES Charity reporting is up to date
MARC FITCH FUND Charity reporting is up to date
WOODHORN CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE NORMA LIPMAN MEMORIAL TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
DENIS PEEL Trustee
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
WYLAM INSTITUTE COMMUNITY CENTRE Charity reporting is up to date
RICHARD PEARS Chair 17 October 2011
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
Don O'Meara Trustee 02 May 2018
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
PROFESSOR RICHARD NIGEL BAILEY Trustee None on record
GRAEME CHARLTON STOBBS Trustee 28 January 2015
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
Simon David Pallett Trustee 17 October 2011
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
JOSEPH COWEN LIFELONG LEARNING CENTRE CIO Charity reporting is up to date
ALFRED AND DOROTHY SHORNEY MEMORIAL TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
ROGER WILLIAM FERN Trustee
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
DEREK CUTTS Trustee
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
BILL GRIFFITHS Trustee
SENHOUSE MUSEUM TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Dr ROBERT COLLINS Trustee 17 October 2011
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
Howard Cleeve Trustee 30 January 2014
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
GRACE MCCOMBIE BA FSA Trustee None on record
GEOFF WOODWARD Trustee
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
Dr NORMAN MCCORD Trustee None on record
Marta Alberti Trustee 29 January 2020
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
DR DAVID JOHN BREEZE Trustee
CUMBERLAND AND WESTMORLAND ANTIQUARIAN AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
JOHN FRANCIS GRIFFITHS Trustee None on record
MRS BERYL CHARLTON Trustee None on record
FRANCES MCINTOSH Trustee 30 January 2014 None on record
MRS KIM BIBBY-WILSON Trustee None on record
SUSAN WARD Trustee
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
DAVID HOWARD HESLOP Trustee None on record
His Honour Christopher Walton Trustee 27 January 2016
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE Recently registered
ROSIE SERDIVILLE Trustee None on record