Linked charities NORTON FOLGATE TRUST
Charity number: 230990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 31/10/1988
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 26/10/2004
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/12/2004
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN GREATER LONDON WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON.
Registration history
- 19 August 1963 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.