Financial history ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - HIGH WYCOMBE BRANCH

Charity number: 231529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £697 £1.49k £1.19k £888 £3.53k
Total expenditure £6.59k £7.04k £4.16k £3.40k £14.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A