CHARITY OF MRS E M A OGILVIE

Charity number: 231543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 March 2021 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 January 2018 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required