Financial history MEMBERS EMERGENCY FUND FOR BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN UK

Charity number: 231723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £292 £1.04k £596 £983 £857
Total expenditure £1.67k £829 £1.20k £1.70k £7.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A