ST CRUX CHARITY - FEOFFMENT ESTATES

Charity number: 231744
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.70k £24.34k £24.51k £25.51k £21.79k
Total expenditure £55.92k £58.56k £21.53k £4.97k £14.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A