OXFORD JEWISH CONGREGATION

Charity number: 231853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Simon Trustee 17 January 2021 None on record
Joel Kaye Chair 17 January 2021 None on record
Sharon Fleming Trustee 17 January 2016 None on record
Yafit Parnes Trustee 17 January 2021 None on record
Sarah Sheppard Trustee 15 January 2017 None on record
Judith Silver Trustee 17 January 2021 None on record
Barry Freilich Trustee 25 January 2015 None on record
SARAH MONTAGU Trustee 15 February 2014
THE FRIENDS OF THE BATE COLLECTION OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS Received: On time
Jill Shatz Trustee 20 January 2019
THE OXFORD SYNAGOGUE AND JEWISH CENTRE LIMITED Received: On time
Dr Tania Davison Trustee 21 January 2018 None on record
Katherine Shock Trustee 17 January 2021 None on record
Tony Samuel Trustee 12 January 2020 None on record
Jonathan Raphael Morris Trustee 25 January 2015 None on record
Dr George Blumberg Trustee 12 January 2020 None on record