Financial history CLINTON-BAKER AUGMENTATION

Charity number: 231854
Charity reporting is overdue by 226 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £602 £614 £630 £639 £652
Total expenditure £602 £614 £630 £639 £652
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A