DAME JANE MAYNARD

Charity number: 231902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.07k £2.86k £2.50k £2.58k £2.05k
Total expenditure £2.19k £2.44k £2.59k £1.81k £1.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A