Trustees BUCKFAST ABBEY TRUST (HELD ICW THE RELIGIOUS COMMUNITY OF BENEDICTINE MONKS ESTABLISHED AT ST MARYS ABBEY BUCKFAST, DEVON)

Charity number: 232497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Right Rev David Roger Charlesworth OSB Chair 09 April 2021
THE ENGLISH BENEDICTINE ORDER OF OULTON ABBEY NEAR STONE, STAFFS
Received: On time
Rev Canon Mark O'Keeffe Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Louise Jessica Hardy Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Dom Mark Andrew Prickett OSB Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Dom Peter Dominic May OSB Trustee 03 March 2020
None on record
Very Reverend Keith Brendan Martel Thomas OSB Trustee 16 July 2019
BELMONT ABBEY GENERAL CIO
Received: On time
Very Reverend Dom Rory Daniel Smyth OSB Trustee 14 June 2019
None on record