Financial history ORDER OF AUGUSTINIAN RECOLLECTS - ST. RITA'S CENTRE

Charity number: 232501
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £251.64k £253.12k £224.84k £240.64k £250.68k
Total expenditure £337.99k £312.53k £289.53k £220.31k £220.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A