BRYAN BECK ESTATE

Charity number: 232552
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.21k £1.21k £109 £2.21k £1.16k
Total expenditure £1.22k £1.23k £1.25k £1.23k £1.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A