Financial history THE COMMUNITY OF THE RESURRECTION

Charity number: 232670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.62m £1.79m £2.08m £1.75m £1.56m
Total expenditure £1.73m £1.82m £1.79m £1.68m £1.59m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £87.27k £105.83k
Income - Donations and legacies £530.00k £580.00k £843.00k £740.00k £727.00k
Income - Other trading activities £95.00k £102.00k £142.00k £37.00k £31.00k
Income - Charitable activities £712.00k £787.00k £801.00k £705.00k £584.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £282.00k £325.00k £290.00k £267.00k £220.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £130.00k £146.00k £346.00k £134.00k £282.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.58m £1.55m £1.44m £1.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £309.00k £242.00k £239.00k £243.00k £190.00k
Expenditure - Governance £12.00k £18.00k £14.00k £17.00k £17.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.00k £6.60k £14.00k £12.00k £14.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £161.00k £80.00k £75.00k £128.00k £89.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0