Governing document KINGS COTTAGES TRUST
Charity number: 232955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 11 SEP 1907 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAY 1909 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCT 1911 AS AMENDED ON 29 DEC 1913 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 MAR 1972 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR AGED PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN EITHER THE URBAN DISTRICT OF BISHOP'S STORTFORD OR THE PARISH OF THORLEY FOR NOT LESS THAN 20 YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BISHOP'S STORTFORD AND PARISH OF THORLEY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.