Trustees KING'S LYNN GENERAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 233003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM JOHN FRAMMINGHAM | Chair |
|
||||||
Rebecca Anne Louise Burridge | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Roy Warren Brain | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|||||
ROBERT JOHN HARRISON | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|||||
KENNETH BANKS | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|||||
KATHRYN EMILY SMITH | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|||||
JOANNE SAUNDERS | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|||||
SHARON MARGARET CAMBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT GEORGE PANNELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
ADRIAN CHARLES THORARINSSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.