Governing document THE TEULU JAMES PANTYFEDWEN EISTEDDFODAU TRUST
Charity number: 233226
Charity reporting is overdue by 262 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 14 NOVEMBER 1963 AS VARIED 11 AUGUST 1965 AND 28 MARCH 1966. SCHEME OF THE 1 JULY 1968. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE FUNDS ARE TO BE USED FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF EISTEDDFODAU ON TWO SEPARATE DAYS IN EVERY YEAR AT PONTRHYDFENDIGAID IN THE COUNTY OF CARDIGAN.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PONTRHYDFENDIGAID
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.