Financial history THE WILLIAM CHESTER ESTATE CHARITY

Charity number: 233327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.25k £10.93k £11.19k £11.33k £11.41k
Total expenditure £7.25k £8.65k £8.64k £10.14k £10.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A