ABBEYFIELD READING SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 233423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.00m £1.07m £995.08k £1.03m £1.19m
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.10m £1.09m £1.07m £1.16m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £145.10k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £58.11k £51.27k £49.10k £31.63k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £974.40k £1.01m £943.80k £981.65k £1.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £1.37k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £1.08m £1.07m £1.06m £1.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.13k £17.18k £16.14k £11.57k £5.61k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.41k £6.21k £4.47k £6.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0