Accounts and annual returns THE JAMES TRUST

Charity number: 233691
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 September 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 June 2017 On time