BARCLAY HALL

Charity number: 233811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 July 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required