TROWBRIDGE PARK CLUB

Charity number: 234057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.33k £12.57k £13.02k £14.87k £14.87k
Total expenditure £17.99k £14.53k £12.14k £6.28k £14.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A