THE INSTITUTE OF FINANCIAL ACCOUNTANTS AND INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BOOK-KEEPERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 234082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £19.67k £19.41k £20.67k £19.91k £15.79k
Total expenditure £27.51k £14.10k £32.45k £28.52k £29.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A