THE WEST SUSSEX COUNTY NURSING BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 234210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.05k £2.97k £1.91k £436 £2.16k
Total expenditure £3.17k £3.61k £2.39k £2.40k £2.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A