Trustees CLEMENTSON MEMORIAL NURSING FUND
Charity number: 234361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV ANDREW CINNAMOND | Chair | 21 November 2011 |
|
|||||||
Barbara McNaught | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Elizabeth Roberts | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Angela Ryan | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Rudge | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN HOLMES | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
JANE JENKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.