Financial history HARROGATE AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity number: 234402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £24.35k £22.73k £20.71k £21.42k £15.54k
Total expenditure £38.50k £37.66k £32.25k £33.22k £24.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A