THE CONGREGATION OF THE LITTLE SISTERS OF THE POOR - ENGLISH PROVINCE

Charity number: 234434
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £16.43m £17.29m £17.96m £17.08m £24.67m
Total expenditure £17.15m £17.89m £18.56m £18.56m £18.92m
Income from government contracts £3.42m £4.33m £3.45m £3.90m £3.96m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.61m £3.26m £2.28m £2.45m £4.07m
Income - Other trading activities £586.64k £564.46k £591.27k £548.59k £425.94k
Income - Charitable activities £13.16m £13.41m £13.42m £13.12m £13.21m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.13k £2.11k £1.25k £3.19k £2.14k
Income - Other £68.58k £57.19k £1.67m £963.30k £6.96m
Income - Legacies £1.19m £1.99m £1.04m £1.33m £860.71k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.13m £17.87m £18.54m £18.56m £18.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £15.78k £21.89k £6.05k £10.82k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £61.29k £63.10k £75.72k £85.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0