Trustees LANGTON HOME FUND
Charity number: 234581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faye Rebecca Scadden | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Emma Wasley | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Joseph Cash | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Kay Suzanne Boyden | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Ciaran Thomas Barr | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Margaret Joyce Simpson | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Mark Enright | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|||||
John Kennedy | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Paula Jane Hayes | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Cyril Francis Johnson | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Timothy Colin Shoveller | Trustee | 25 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth goodland | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.