ST MARGARET'S CHARITY

Charity number: 234626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Mary Starsmore Trustee 25 October 2021
PARISH PIECE CHARITY Received: On time
MARGARET GILLESPIE Chair
PARISH PIECE CHARITY Received: On time
MAUREEN BELCHER Trustee 25 October 2015
PARISH PIECE CHARITY Received: On time
THE FREDERICK WIDDOWSON FUND Received: On time
Patrick Hamish Carnan Trustee 25 October 2021
PARISH PIECE CHARITY Received: On time
Rachael Louise Howsin Trustee 18 January 2021
PARISH PIECE CHARITY Received: On time
John Dean Orton Trustee 22 July 2018
PARISH PIECE CHARITY Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER JOHN NEWMAN Trustee 25 October 2015
PARISH PIECE CHARITY Received: On time
THE FREDERICK WIDDOWSON FUND Received: On time
JANET MARGARET BASS Trustee
PARISH PIECE CHARITY Received: On time
Cllr Annette Dawn Byrne Trustee 17 October 2016
PARISH PIECE CHARITY Received: On time