MARY CURTIS'S MATERNITY CHARITY

Charity number: 235036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.30k £2.34k £2.39k £2.44k £2.18k
Total expenditure £9.00k £0 £7.00k £1.50k £15.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A