Financial history THE CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 235039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £629 £10.60k £342 £349 £357
Total expenditure £1.23k £11.13k £630 £30 £2.03k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A