THE NEWBURY AND THATCHAM WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 235077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.94k £3.17k £3.26k £5.30k £3.37k
Total expenditure £2.76k £3.08k £5.16k £5.28k £2.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A