THE LYNDHURST TRUST

Charity number: 235252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £39.71k £41.43k £37.67k £41.20k £28.69k
Total expenditure £98.20k £79.28k £81.79k £84.32k £75.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A