Trustees THE MANCHESTER LITERARY AND PHILOSOPHICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 235313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Wright | Chair | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lanigan | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Carstensen | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cigdem Balim | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Wareham | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Manju Bhavnani | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kia-Shu Tso | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Celia Baker | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric James Thomas | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mbarga | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dhun Daji | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cameron | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Hilton | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Rees | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.