Trustees THE CONVERTS' AID SOCIETY
Charity number: 235705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roland Edward Hayes | Chair | 10 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
Rev Daniel Humphreys | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Emanuela Watson-Gandy | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Mary Mellor | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Victoria Stonier | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
James Phillip Turner | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Josephine Clare Gough | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Hambleton | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
MR S DOYLE | Trustee | 11 July 2007 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.