Financial history THE HOSPITAL OF ST THOMAS THE APOSTLE IN DONCASTER

Charity number: 235958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £75.54k £77.22k £82.78k £83.88k £78.19k
Total expenditure £60.81k £35.14k £58.72k £49.39k £68.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.01k £0 N/A N/A N/A