CABMEN'S SHELTER FUND

Charity number: 236108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £93.53k £91.65k £97.83k £109.04k £106.91k
Total expenditure £92.66k £95.22k £98.08k £82.93k £104.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £70.00k