YESHURUN HEBREW CONGREGATION

Charity number: 236420
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £347.17k £341.87k £324.78k £396.56k £361.17k
Total expenditure £285.30k £327.91k £310.69k £367.63k £333.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A