EXMOUTH ANIMALS DISPENSARY

Charity number: 236446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £43.12k £44.21k £42.28k £45.90k £46.08k
Total expenditure £24.62k £46.76k £25.04k £38.63k £68.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A