THE BROTHERS OF THE FIRST ORDER OF THE SOCIETY OF ST FRANCIS

Charity number: 236464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £815.76k £873.98k £833.33k £709.25k £880.25k
Total expenditure £789.73k £900.01k £910.81k £913.38k £851.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £4.94k
Income - Donations and legacies £706.48k £768.50k £730.54k £606.26k £746.87k
Income - Other trading activities £50.35k £44.01k £39.86k £39.96k £37.79k
Income - Charitable activities £3.98k £3.44k £6.12k £2.04k £8.36k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £35.60k £34.46k £28.92k £32.28k £39.48k
Income - Other £19.36k £23.57k £27.89k £28.72k £47.74k
Income - Legacies £30.23k £551 £50.32k £26.78k £219.16k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £760.30k £871.19k £874.90k £896.92k £836.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds £29.44k £28.82k £35.91k £16.45k £14.53k
Expenditure - Governance £19.87k £18.32k £23.73k £25.83k £24.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £49.10k £93.82k £82.26k £80.64k £61.44k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £474