THE BROTHERS OF THE FIRST ORDER OF THE SOCIETY OF ST FRANCIS

Charity number: 236464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Br Martin Price SSF Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Br Alf Micael Carlstrom SSF Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Br John Richard Hennings SSF Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Br James Mohun Yonge SSF Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Br William Clark Berge SSF Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Br Christopher John SSF Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
Br Austin Keith Iverson Davis SSF Trustee 03 June 2016 None on record
Br Benedict Winsper SSF Chair None on record
Br Cristian Buliga SSF Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Br Malcolm Fountain SSF Trustee 30 March 2021 None on record
Br David Lanstrom SSF Trustee 30 September 2020 None on record
Br Richard Sydney Double SSF Trustee 30 January 2021 None on record
Br Joseph Dickson SSF Trustee 31 March 2017 None on record
Br Peter Zeltins SSF Trustee 30 March 2021 None on record