CHARITY OF MARY GODFREY

Charity number: 236724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £673 £4.44k £2.62k £3.15k £4.00k
Total expenditure £1.22k £1.08k £1.56k £1.76k £1.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A