Accounts and annual returns WHITLEY ANIMAL PROTECTION TRUST

Charity number: 236746
Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window