Trustees THE FREE CHURCH FEDERAL COUNCIL (INCORPORATED)
Charity number: 236878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev HELEN CAMERON | Chair | 31 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev DANIEL RAY YARNELL | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Yvonne Campbell | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Major David Evans | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
PASTOR JOSHUA BANDELE | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev DESETA Florence DAVIS | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
REV DR HUGH OSGOOD | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev JAMES ALEXANDER BRESLIN | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
ERIC SOUTHWICK | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Rev TREVOR HOWARD | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER WHITELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.