CHARITY OF JOHN DODGSON

Charity number: 237370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 March 2020 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 November 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required