Financial history THE CECIL AND ALAN PILKINGTON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 237623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.83m £3.80m £3.67m £3.55m £3.53m
Total expenditure £3.54m £3.73m £3.54m £2.93m £3.21m
Income from government contracts £85.96k £77.45k £85.10k £1.71k £6.58k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.08k £354.50k £133.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £87.04k £76.72k £96.63k £429.81k £209.08k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £394.27k £387.70k £389.35k £150.43k £268.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.35m £3.34m £3.18m £2.97m £3.05m
Income - Other £0 £323 £5.79k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.27m £3.46m £3.34m £2.93m £3.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £266.12k £262.21k £198.96k £1.65k £1.50k
Expenditure - Governance £107.04k £114.24k £110.02k £117.95k £111.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £91.00k £75.00k £75.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £266.12k £262.21k £198.96k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0