THE BUTTERWICK CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 237697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.29k £11.21k £10.89k £15.61k £13.31k
Total expenditure £5.50k £3.92k £5.23k £6.06k £2.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A