Trustees BRACKLEY UNITED FEOFFEE CHARITY
Charity number: 238067

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caryl Billingham MBE | Chair |
|
||||||||
Paul Wiltshire | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Bagot-Webb | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Jane Sharps | Trustee | 22 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Richard Duncan | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER CARTMELL | Trustee | 22 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Alexander James Britchfield | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ELAINE JOY DIXON | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|||||||
DENISE STEVENS | Trustee | 25 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr PHILIP JOHN STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
George William Britchfield FNAEAMARLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TREVOR JOHN FREDERICK GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER JOHN JESKINS FCCA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.