Trustees Elemosynary Charity of Joseph Palmer
Charity number: 239323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Malcolm | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Popham | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alexander Ian Munro | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Michael James Axton | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margery Day | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Stephen Paul Bax | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.